+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On December 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
- Substituted for A918 (1R)
On November 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (6)
January 5, 2018: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
December 7, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
December 7, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A918 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
November 30, 2017: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
May 9, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
March 7, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor