+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On December 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
+ − Votes (2)
December 16, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
December 5, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13