+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (25-5)
On August 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (61-10-5)
- Substituted for A5066 (1R)
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (24-8)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (25-0) (Addiego)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (9)
September 12, 2019: ADOPT GR
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
June 20, 2019: SUB FOR A5066 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
June 20, 2019: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
June 20, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 5
March 14, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 8
February 21, 2019: AMEND
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 15
February 21, 2019: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
February 7, 2019: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor