+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On December 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
- Substituted for A5151 (1R)
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
December 17, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
December 17, 2020: SUB FOR A5151
- Present/NV: 80
December 17, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
December 15, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor