+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.41.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (48-24-0)
- Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (32-2)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (27-5)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On December 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-27-0)
- Substituted for A5089 (1R)
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-4)
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (7)
March 25, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 7
March 25, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
February 19, 2021: ADOPT GR
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 8
December 17, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 4
December 17, 2020: SUB FOR A5089
- Present/NV: 80
December 17, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
December 15, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor