+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.40.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-8)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1)
- Substituted for A4830 (2R)
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (27-10)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (23-0) (Gill)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (8)
March 25, 2021: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
March 1, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 10
March 1, 2021: SUB FOR A4830
- Present/NV: 80
February 24, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
February 19, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 17
February 19, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
February 11, 2021: r/SCS
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor