+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-1-0)
- Substituted for A3607 (1R)
On January 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On December 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On November 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 11, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
January 11, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3607 Aca
- Present/NV: 79
January 7, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
December 17, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
November 16, 2015: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5