+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.138.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
- Substituted for A4898
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4898
- Present/NV: 80
June 19, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
May 25, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1