+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.224.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted for A4865
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-3)
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On November 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 5
June 27, 2019: SUB FOR A4865
- Present/NV: 80
June 10, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
May 13, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
March 4, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor