+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.190.
On December 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-9-2)
- Substituted for A4621
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
On October 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (27-9)
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 17, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 12
December 17, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4621
- Present/NV: 79
November 9, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
October 22, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
October 19, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1