+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-4-11)
- Motion To Table (Voice) (Greenwald)
- Motion To Recommit to AAP (Auth)
- Substituted for A99
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
- Emergency Resolution (37-0) (Kean)
- Senate Amendment (34-0) (Sweeney)
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (9)
March 23, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
March 23, 2017: MOTION TAB MOTION
- Present/NV: 80
March 23, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A99
- Present/NV: 80
March 20, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
March 13, 2017: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
March 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 13, 2017: AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2017: EMERGENCY
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 9, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor