+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On December 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0)
- Substituted for A4444 (ACS)
On November 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On November 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
+ − Votes (4)
December 19, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 80
December 19, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4444 Acs
- Present/NV: 80
November 18, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
November 14, 2013: r/SCS
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor