+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.186.
On December 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0)
- Substituted for A4531
On December 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (34-0)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 17, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 13
December 17, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4531
- Present/NV: 79
December 14, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
July 23, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 11, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor