+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A4196 (3R)
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 23, 2015: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
June 8, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11