+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.221.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
- Substituted for A4389
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Transportation Committee
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 20, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 20, 2019: SUB FOR A4389
- Present/NV: 80
May 16, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
September 27, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 13, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1