+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.122.
On October 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-3)
- Substituted for A4613
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
On September 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Education Committee
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
+ − Votes (5)
October 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 9
October 29, 2020: SUB FOR A4613
- Present/NV: 80
October 22, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
September 14, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor