+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.94.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
- Substituted for A4425
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (7)
June 22, 2017: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 19, 2017: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2017: ADOPT GR
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 16, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4425
- Present/NV: 80
March 16, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
February 27, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor