+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (5)
On October 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A4528 (1R)
On September 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (2)
September 15, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
August 20, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor