+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (43-30-1)
- Substituted for A4281
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (23-14)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 26, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 6
March 26, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4281
- Present/NV: 80
March 23, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
March 9, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor