+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.113.
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
- Substituted for A4007 (ACS)
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (5)
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 24, 2020: SUB FOR A4007
- Present/NV: 80
August 27, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 24, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
August 21, 2020: r/SCS
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor