+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.48.
On January 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
- Substituted for A4043
On November 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On October 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Votes (4)
January 31, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
January 31, 2019: SUB FOR A4043
- Present/NV: 80
October 29, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
October 15, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor