+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (33-1)
- Emergency Resolution (35-0) (Sarlo)
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On November 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
December 18, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
March 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2017: EMERGENCY
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
March 9, 2017: r/Sca
- Yeas: 13