+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.28.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-9-4)
- Substituted for A4631
On December 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-1)
On July 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 11, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
January 11, 2021: SUB FOR A4631
- Present/NV: 79
December 15, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
July 30, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
July 28, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1