+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.1.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
On December 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
- Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Codey)
- 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0)
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On October 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0)
- Substituted for A4446
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On October 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (8)
January 11, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
December 17, 2020: ADOPT GR
- Yeas: 40
December 17, 2020: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 40
December 17, 2020: EMERGENCY
- Yeas: 40
October 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
October 29, 2020: SUB FOR A4446
- Present/NV: 80
October 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 20, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor