+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On August 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
- Substituted for A4413
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On July 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
+ − Votes (4)
August 27, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 27, 2020: SUB FOR A4413
- Present/NV: 80
August 27, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor