+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
- Substituted for A4026
On December 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 11, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
January 11, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4026
- Present/NV: 79
December 10, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
June 25, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
May 4, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9