+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A3061 (2R)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Labor Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 24, 2013: r/Sca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 13, 2013: r w/o rec.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor