+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (5)
On November 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A3427 (2R)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2013: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1