+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.254.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
- Substituted for A605 (ACS)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-1)
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitution (34-0) (Singleton)
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (30-0) (Singleton)
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Votes (9)
June 27, 2019: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
June 20, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 20, 2019: SUB FOR A605 Acs
- Present/NV: 80
May 20, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
December 17, 2018: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 17, 2018: SENATE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 25, 2018: AMEND
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
June 18, 2018: r/SCS
- Yeas: 5