+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On June 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-10-0)
- Substituted for A3190 (1R)
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 7
June 30, 2018: SUB FOR A3190 Aa
- Present/NV: 80
March 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 13