+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On December 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (60-9-0)
- Substituted for A4069 (1R)
On December 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (34-0)
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (33-0) (Smith)
On October 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading w/o recommendation
On October 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
+ − Votes (8)
January 7, 2016: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
December 17, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 10
December 17, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4069 Aca
- Present/NV: 79
December 14, 2015: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
July 23, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 29, 2015: AMEND
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 29, 2015: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
October 27, 2014: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1