+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.128.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
- Substituted for A4007
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On November 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
On October 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4007
- Present/NV: 80
June 26, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
November 14, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
October 13, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor