+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.42.
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-1-2)
- Substituted for A3978 (1R)
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
- Transferred to Assembly Labor Committee
On May 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2020: SUB FOR A3978
- Present/NV: 80
June 16, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
May 14, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor