+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (5)
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (31-6)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (26-0) (Cryan)
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (4)
July 30, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2020: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 29, 2020: AMEND
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 14
May 27, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor