+ − Full Texts (13)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concur by Senate Amendments (36-1)
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (71-5-3)
- Substituted for A4032 (1R)
On September 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (28-4)
- Emergency Resolution (34-1) (Brown)
- Senate Amendment (31-0) (Sweeney)
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (9)
June 3, 2021: CONCUR ASMB AM/AM
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
September 24, 2020: SUB FOR A4032
- Present/NV: 80
September 22, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 13
June 15, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 8
June 15, 2020: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 15, 2020: AMEND
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 9
June 15, 2020: EMERGENCY
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
June 11, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1