+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.62.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-4-2)
- Substituted for A3879 (1R)
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (26-8)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
March 23, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3879 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
February 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
January 12, 2017: r/Sca
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor