+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.301.
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1)
- Substituted for A4097
On December 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On December 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 8, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 11
January 8, 2018: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4097
- Present/NV: 80
December 18, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
December 7, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
November 20, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor