+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A709 (2R)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (27-0) (Kyrillos)
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (31-0) (Whelan)
On October 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (3)
January 13, 2015: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
January 13, 2015: AMEND
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 13
October 9, 2014: r/Sca
- Yeas: 9