+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On May 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (66-0-14)
- Substituted for A3956 (1R)
On May 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
On April 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
On April 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
+ − Votes (5)
May 14, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 66
May 14, 2020: SUB FOR A3956
- Present/NV: 80
May 14, 2020: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
April 13, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor