+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.213.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
- Substituted for A3613 (3R)
On January 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-1)
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2019: SUB FOR A3613 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
December 17, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
December 3, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2