+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (34-0) (Singleton)
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (37-0) (Singleton)
On October 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitution (32-0) (Singleton)
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
January 31, 2019: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
January 31, 2019: AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
October 29, 2018: SENATE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
October 15, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor