+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A970 (ACS/2R)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (22-0) (Singleton)
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
February 19, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 18
October 22, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
August 20, 2020: r/SCS
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1