+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.253.
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (66-8-1)
- Substituted for A2776 (1R)
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (32-5)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (6)
December 18, 2017: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A2776 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
June 12, 2017: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
June 16, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1