+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A892
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2014: r/SCS
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor