+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.59.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
- Substituted for A3785 (1R)
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (7)
June 29, 2020: SUB FOR A3785
- Present/NV: 80
June 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
June 29, 2020: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 26, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
June 17, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
June 15, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
May 27, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor