+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2014, c.10.
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-2)
- Substituted for A3152 (1R)
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2014: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3152 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
June 12, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 9, 2014: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor