+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On September 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.93.
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
- Substituted for A2481
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On September 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (4)
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
September 24, 2020: SUB FOR A2481
- Present/NV: 80
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 22, 2020: r/SCS
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor