+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2013, c.121.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
- Substituted for A3142
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
On October 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
June 24, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3142
- Present/NV: 80
June 10, 2013: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
February 7, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
October 1, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13