+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (4)
On December 3, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
On November 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On October 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (2)
November 29, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
October 11, 2012: r/SCS
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor