+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-4)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (60-5-11)
- Substituted for A3250 (1R)
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On June 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-1)
On June 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
+ − Votes (6)
May 13, 2013: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
March 21, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
March 21, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3250 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
March 14, 2013: r/Aca
- Yeas: 4
June 21, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
June 4, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor